Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 584 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4132 Week
» 5022 Month
» 313003 Year
» 1197384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1195 m/e 10/1902
LNER (1924) 8195 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5545 m/e 09/1946
BR 65545 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1902
J1707/1926
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B54
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal Mon 26/10/1959
Service Life 57 yrs , 26 dys
Information Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 5w/e 22/09/1951
33A Plaistow 4w/e 22/03/1952
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 19/04/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 23/01/1954
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
   Withdrawn 26/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as GER Number 1195
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8195    
07/1926 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1926 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5545    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65545    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65545    

prev prev