Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1082 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7289 Week
» 4802 Month
» 232686 Year
» 1454251 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1196 m/e 10/1902
LNER (1924) 8196 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5546 m/e 11/1946
BR 65546 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1902
J1701/1924
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B54
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal Mon 04/01/1960
Service Life 57 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1902
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/01/1952
   Withdrawn 04/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/01/1952
WDN   04/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1196
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8196    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5546    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65546    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65546    

prev prev