Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1341 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14747 Week
» 67763 Month
» 187290 Year
» 3214143 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1197 |
m/e |
10/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8197 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5547 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
65547 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B54 |
To Service |
During 10/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/09/1954 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
27/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/09/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1197 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8197 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5547 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65547 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
06/09/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65547 |
|
|