Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1198 m/e 10/1902
LNER (1924) 8198 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5548 m/e 09/1946
BR 65548 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1902
J1712/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B54
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1960
Service Life 57 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KL Kings Lynn 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 21/10/1950
31A Cambridge 5w/e 23/08/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 12/04/1958
   Withdrawn 07/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as GER Number 1198
Built at Stratford Works
   
12/1921 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8198    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5548    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 65548    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65548    

prev prev