Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1201 |
m/e |
12/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8201 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5551 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65551 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P54 |
To Service |
During 12/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 10/02/1960 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1949 |
Stratford Works |
On 20/8 the Repair Shop contained the following: Nos. 1542, 2501/07/90, 64667/91, 65440, 5551, 8317, 8576, 8654, 9633, 69653, 9685. The last M. & G.N. 'J.93' tank-No. 8489-is in Stratford Yard. Stratford still paints 'British Railways' on tanks and tenders which do not carry the crest. |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1201 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8201 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5551 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65551 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65551 |
|
|