Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 233 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7693 Week
» 5206 Month
» 233090 Year
» 1454655 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1203 m/e 12/1902
LNER (1924) 8203 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5553 m/e 05/1946
BR 65553 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1612/1902
J1703/1925
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P54
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal Tue 21/04/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1902
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 21/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC MEL   w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 01/05/1948
WDN IMM Immingham 19/02/1949
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 05/11/1949
WDN   21/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1203
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8203    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5553    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65553    
21/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65553    

prev prev