Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2113 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19916 Week
» 72932 Month
» 192459 Year
» 3219312 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1204 |
m/e |
12/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8204 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5554 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65554 |
m/e |
03/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P54 |
To Service |
During 12/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1902 |
MAR |
|
March |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/09/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
08/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1204 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8204 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5554 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
03/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65554 |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65554 |
|
|