Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1121 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8581 Week
» 6094 Month
» 233978 Year
» 1455543 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1206 m/e 01/1903
LNER (1924) 8206 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5556 m/e 08/1946
BR 65556 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1601/1903
J1702/1925
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P54
To Service During 01/1903
Withdrawal Thu 16/03/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1903
MAR March 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 12/04/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn 16/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   16/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1959 Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1903 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1206
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8206    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5556    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65556    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
16/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 65556    

prev prev