Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 164 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17967 Week
» 70983 Month
» 190510 Year
» 3217363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1145 |
m/e |
11/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8145 |
|
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4655 |
|
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64655 |
|
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill / N. Gresley |
Class |
J19 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T77 |
To Service |
During 11/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/08/1961 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1145 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8145 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4655 |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64655 |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
03/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64655 |
|
|