Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4112 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17518 Week
» 70534 Month
» 190061 Year
» 3216914 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1274 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8274 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4679 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64679 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D81 |
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/01/1961 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
w/e |
04/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1274 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8274 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4679 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64679 |
|
|
04/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64679 |
|
|