Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 275 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2614 Week
» 8748 Month
» 236632 Year
» 1458197 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1277 m/e 09/1922
LNER (1924) 8277 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 4682 m/e 11/1946
BR 64682 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J20
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2009/1922
J20/108/1947
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number M87
To Service During 09/1922
Withdrawal Fri 23/09/1960
Service Life 38 yrs , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1922
STR Stratford 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 23/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   23/11/1950
WDN   23/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804
30/06/1950 Renumbering of locomotives 63207 advised as renumbered 3/6 was previously advised 26/3/49; it is believed that 64682 was renumbered at the same time, but not advised. 3002 was renumbered 63002 as advised 29/5/48. 63213, now advised as condemned 19/6, has not been advised as renumbered from 3213. The renumbering of the 'N.4' class was completed with No. 69240 by 10/6/50 so far as the surviving stock is concerned, though 9226/41/3/7 were withdrawn as such. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1922 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1277
Built at Stratford Works
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8277    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4682    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64682    
23/09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64682    

prev prev