Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1279 m/e 09/1922
LNER (1924) 8279 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 4684 m/e 12/1946
BR 64684 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J20
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2009/1922
J20/107/1944
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number M87
To Service During 09/1922
Withdrawal Mon 27/06/1960
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34B Hornsey 4w/e 20/01/1951
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
31A Cambridge w/e 21/11/1959
   Withdrawn 27/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1922 To Service To service as GER Number 1279
Built at Stratford Works
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8279    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4684    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64684    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64684    

prev prev