Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 132 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4947 Week
» 11081 Month
» 238965 Year
» 1460530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1282 m/e 10/1922
LNER (1924) 8282 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 4687 on 17/02/1946
BR 64687 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J20
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2010/1922
J20/103/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number M87
To Service During 10/1922
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1922
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31B March 4w/e 19/05/1951
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March w/e 12/05/1951
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works (Paint Shop) The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1922 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1282
Built at Stratford Works
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8282    
17/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4687    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 64687    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64687    

prev prev