Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1283 m/e 11/1922
LNER (1924) 8283 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 4688 m/e 17/02/1946
BR 64688 m/e 06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J20
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2011/1922
J20/112/1943
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number M87
To Service During 11/1922
Withdrawal Mon 12/01/1959
Service Life 36 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1951
   Withdrawn 12/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1922 To Service To service as GER Number 1283
Built at Stratford Works
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8283    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4688    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
06/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 64688    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64688    

prev prev