Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3774 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17180 Week
» 70196 Month
» 189723 Year
» 3216576 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1286 |
m/e |
12/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8286 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4691 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64691 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y87 |
To Service |
During 12/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1922 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
29/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1949 |
Stratford Works |
On 20/8 the Repair Shop contained the following: Nos. 1542, 2501/07/90, 64667/91, 65440, 5551, 8317, 8576, 8654, 9633, 69653, 9685. The last M. & G.N. 'J.93' tank-No. 8489-is in Stratford Yard. Stratford still paints 'British Railways' on tanks and tenders which do not carry the crest. |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1286 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8286 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4691 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64691 |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64691 |
|
|