Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1288 m/e 12/1922
LNER (1924) 8288 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 4693 m/e 03/02/1946
BR 64693 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J20
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2012/1922
J20/109/1947
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number Y87
To Service During 12/1922
Withdrawal Mon 22/08/1960
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 6w/e 25/12/1954
30A Stratford 5w/e 18/06/1955
   Withdrawn 22/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1922 To Service To service as GER Number 1288
Built at Stratford Works
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8288    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4693    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 64693    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64693    

prev prev