Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1978 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15384 Week
» 68400 Month
» 187927 Year
» 3214780 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1289 |
m/e |
12/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8289 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4694 |
on |
09/02/1946 |
British Railways |
64694 |
w/e |
11/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y87 |
To Service |
During 12/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 06/01/1960 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1289 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8289 |
|
|
09/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4694 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
11/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64694 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64694 |
|
|