Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 711 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1658 Week
» 20440 Month
» 268733 Year
» 1153114 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1289 m/e 12/1922
LNER (1924) 8289 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 4694 m/e 09/02/1946
BR 64694 w/e 11/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J20
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2012/1922
J20/109/1947
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number Y87
To Service During 12/1922
Withdrawal Wed 06/01/1960
Service Life 37 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 22/03/1952
31B March 4w/e 19/04/1952
31A Cambridge 6w/e 25/12/1954
30A Stratford 5w/e 18/06/1955
   Withdrawn 06/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1922 To Service To service as GER Number 1289
Built at Stratford Works
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8289    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4694    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64694    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64694    

prev prev