Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 569 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18372 Week
» 71388 Month
» 190915 Year
» 3217768 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1290 |
m/e |
12/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8290 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4695 |
on |
22/02/1946 |
British Railways |
64695 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y87 |
To Service |
During 12/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 12/01/1960 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1922 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
21/11/1953 |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
5w/e |
18/06/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/01/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
18/06/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/01/1959 |
Bury St. Edmunds MPD |
From 5th January this shed became a diesel depot for Cambridge diesel cars and a diesel shunter; the last steam engines on shed (4th January) were J20s 64661/6/95, 65457/61; B12s 61573/5 were withdrawn from here on 1st January, 1959. |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1290 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8290 |
|
|
22/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4695 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64695 |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
12/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64695 |
|
|