Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2013 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19816 Week
» 72832 Month
» 192359 Year
» 3219212 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1292 |
m/e |
01/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8292 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4697 |
on |
28/01/1946 |
British Railways |
64697 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y87 |
To Service |
During 01/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1923 |
MAR |
|
March |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/09/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/11/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works) |
New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1292 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8292 |
|
|
28/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4697 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64697 |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64697 |
|
|