Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1332 Today
» 1394 Yesterday
» 6499 Week
» 6499 Month
» 195634 Year
» 1417199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1293 m/e 01/1923
LNER (1924) 8293 m/e 06/1924
LNER (1946) 4698 m/e 05/1946
BR 64698 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class J20
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J2001/1923
J20/102/1955
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number Y87
To Service During 01/1923
Withdrawal Mon 20/03/1961
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1923
MAR March 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge w/e 21/11/1959
   Withdrawn 20/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   20/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1961 Stratford Works Old Works: D2202/3/16, D2950, D3496, 11157, 12132. Scrap Yard: 64698, 64767, 67726, 69681, 69721. Works Yard: D2214, D5047/94, D8405, 62015, 69656, 69702. Diesel Erecting Shop: D200/48, D5036/59/60/6/95, D5630/6/66, D5901/4, D8206, D8403/6. Erecting Shop Yard: D2575, D5040/1, D5903, DEPT33/44/5. Works Shunters: D2209/17, D2958, 12111. SLS/196105


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1923 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1293
Built at Stratford Works
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8293    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4698    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64698    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64698    

prev prev