Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17912 Week
» 70928 Month
» 190455 Year
» 3217308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
613 |
m/e |
05/1889 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5035 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
65035 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
12.89 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1889 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/05/1956 off Heaton (52B) |
Service Life |
67 yrs , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BLA |
Blaydon |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
RBY |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1909 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
08/1927 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1889 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 613 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 12.89 |
|
|
06/1909 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
08/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5035 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65035 |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
28/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65035 from Heaton (52B) |
|
|
06/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|