Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 6 Today
» 96 Yesterday
» 4270 Week
» 22033 Month
» 128347 Year
» 639449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 432   06/1890
LNER (1946) 5058   12/1946
BR 65058   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Worsdell
Class J21
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J21 Compound06/1890
J21 Simple05/1911
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gateshead Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 21.90
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 06/1890
Withdrawal During 11/1949 off Doncaster (DON)
Scrapping During 12/1949 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 59 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham 30/03/1947
ALLOC RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 13/07/1947
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 11/12/1948
WDN DON Doncaster 28/11/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1911 Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders
09/1927 Fitted with 19" cylinders and piston valves


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1890 To Service To service as NER Number 432
Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 21.90
   
05/1911 Modification Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders    
09/1927 Modification Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and piston valves    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5058    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 65058 but not taken up    
11/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 5058 from Doncaster (DON)    
12/1949 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev