Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1890 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15296 Week
» 68312 Month
» 187839 Year
» 3214692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
665 |
m/e |
04/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5081 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65081 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1908 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
01/1908 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
12/1940 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
01/1944 |
Superheater removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 665 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 6.91 |
|
|
01/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
01/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
12/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
01/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheater removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5081 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65081 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (KBY) |
|
|
19/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (NLN) |
|
|
30/01/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65081 from Northallerton (NLN) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|