Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1801 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19604 Week
» 72620 Month
» 192147 Year
» 3219000 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1562 |
m/e |
06/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5090 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65090 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
14.91 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/12/1955 off Blaydon (52C) |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
19/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1910 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
04/1910 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
03/1925 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/08/1954 |
Scenic Excursions |
The peaceful Sunday at Rothbury station was livened up by the arrival of two 'Scenic' excursions from Newcastle on 15/8/54. They were run via Hexham, Bellingham, Scots Gap junction, Rothbury and Morpeth, and time was allowed to admire the station gardens at certain points. The route meant that four reversals had to take place. Class J21 0-6.0's were used, Nos. 65090 an 65110, from Blaydon shed, and they were well turned out, with polished brasswork, etc. Each train was composed of five corridors, and every seat was booked. |
SLS/195410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1562 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 14.91 |
|
|
04/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
04/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
03/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5090 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65090 |
|
|
19/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
05/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65090 from Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
01/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|