31/07/1948 |
Darlington Works |
'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
03/06/1961 |
North Eastern Region |
Locomotion and Derwent have now been returned to their pedestals at Darlington station after renovation at North Road Works. The boiler lagging of Locomotion and the woodwork of its tender have been treated with clear varnish to show the natural colour of the wood, whilst the iron-work has been painted black. In the case of Derwent, the boiler lagging and the two tenders have been painted green; the shade is not unlike the BR Brunswick green but is rather more blue. Polished iron-work (big ends etc), brass and copper add much to the present splendid appearance of these two famous veterans. The pioneer electric locomotive of the N.E.R. has also received a general overhaul at South Gosforth and is now resplendent in NER green, lined out with black and white. The BR emblem and the number (e26500) are displayed on the left-hand side of the cab door and the NER coat of Arms on the right. The lining has been somewhat simplified from that used in 1904 but the original square-cornered panelling has been reproduced. It is understood that 26501 is to receive a similar overhaul and repaint which seems to indicate that these two locomotives will remain at work for a good many more years. The last ex-LNE Class T1 4-8-0T was on the Works road at Bank Top shed on 11th June. The frames of J21 65099, which is scheduled for preser-vation, are still standing in the yard at North Road. |
SLS/196107 |
04/06/1961 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. |
SLS/196107 |
09/07/1961 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. |
SLS/196108 |
11/11/1961 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. |
SLS/196201 |
14/01/1962 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. |
SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. |
SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 |
Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. |
SLS/196205 |
14/07/1962 |
Darlington Works (Sidings) |
Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. |
SLS/196209 |
18/01/1964 |
Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) |
Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. |
SLS/196402 |
01/02/1964 |
Branch line news (Works Yard) |
Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. |
SLS/196403 |
25/04/1964 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. |
SLS/196406 |
04/07/1964 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. |
SLS/196408 |
19/09/1964 |
Darlington Works (Yard) |
New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. |
SLS/196410 |