Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 67316 Month
» 186843 Year
» 3213696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1588 |
m/e |
01/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5101 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65101 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
7.92 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1892 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1950 off Blaydon (52C) |
Service Life |
58 yrs , 3 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1892 |
BLA |
|
Blaydon |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BLA |
|
Blaydon |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
RMH |
|
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
BLA |
|
Blaydon |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BLA |
Blaydon |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
RMH |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
BLA |
Blaydon |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
WDN |
52C |
Blaydon |
on |
14/04/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1907 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
04/1907 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1588 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 7.92 |
|
|
04/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
04/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5101 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65101 but not taken up |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
1950 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|
04/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5101 from Blaydon (52C) |
|
|