Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1611 |
m/e |
12/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5112 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
65112 |
on |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J21 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
33.92 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1892 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1949 off Hull Springhead (HLS) |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1904 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1611 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 33.92 |
|
|
07/1904 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5112 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65112 but not taken up |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|
11/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5112 from Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|