|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1898 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1963 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
||
12/1939 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
12/1939 | Reinstated | Reinstated to To North Eastern Region (91N) | ||
23/01/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5647 | ||
13/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
08/1948 | Modification | Diagram 67A boiler fitted | ||
08/1948 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65647 | ||
23/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
20/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
07/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
21/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
22/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
26/05/1956 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65647 |