|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1956 | Sunderland MPD | On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. | SLS/195611 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1898 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1988 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
||
01/1917 | Modification | Diagram 67 (Superheated) boiler fitted | ||
01/1917 | Modification | Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5662 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65662 | ||
08/1951 | Modification | Diagram 67A boiler fitted | ||
07/1954 | Modification | Diagram 67B boiler fitted | ||
17/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
21/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
06/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65662 |