Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 714 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18517 Week
» 71533 Month
» 191060 Year
» 3217913 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2061 |
m/e |
01/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5690 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65690 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 01/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 18/11/1954 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50G |
Whitby |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/11/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1944 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2061 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1939 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
10/1939 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
01/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5690 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65690 |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
18/11/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65690 |
|
|