|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1900 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2065 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
||
05/1916 | Modification | Diagram 67 (Superheated) boiler fitted | ||
05/1916 | Modification | Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves | ||
10/1939 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) | ||
10/1939 | Reinstated | Reinstated to To North Eastern Region (91N) | ||
03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5691 | ||
11/1947 | Modification | Diagram 67A boiler fitted | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR) | ||
06/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65691 | ||
17/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
24/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
11/03/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
30/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65691 |