Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1585 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19388 Week
» 72404 Month
» 191931 Year
» 3218784 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2071 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5696 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65696 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 05/12/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1939 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2071 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (NBH) |
|
|
01/1939 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1939 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5696 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65696 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
05/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65696 |
|
|