Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 91 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17894 Week
» 70910 Month
» 190437 Year
» 3217290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2072 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5697 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65697 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 26/11/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
51F |
West Auckland |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
ALLOC |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/11/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1947 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
12/1948 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2072 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1940 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5697 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65697 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) |
|
|
26/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65697 |
|
|