|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Sidings) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2134 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
||
02/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) | ||
02/1940 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
10/1943 | Modification | Diagram 67A boiler fitted | ||
07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5720 | ||
11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) | ||
11/1947 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65720 | ||
20/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
17/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
09/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65720 |