Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 802 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18605 Week
» 71621 Month
» 191148 Year
» 3218001 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2141 |
m/e |
11/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5726 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65726 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J25 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 18/06/1962 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1936 |
Diagram "398" boiler fitted |
01/1940 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
02/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1945 |
Vacuum Ejector removed |
10/1945 |
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
03/1948 |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1902 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2141 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1936 |
Modification |
Diagram "398" boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1940 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1940 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (To cover for Dean 0-6-0's requisitioned by the WD) |
|
|
02/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
10/1945 |
Modification |
Diagram 67 (Saturated) boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5726 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Modification |
Diagram 67A boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65726 |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
18/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65726 |
|
|