Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1215 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14621 Week
» 67637 Month
» 187164 Year
» 3214017 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
434 |
m/e |
06/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5733 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65733 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 02/01/1959 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
Information |
Shaped cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1911 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
04/1941 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 434 Built at Darlington Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1911 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1941 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5733 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65733 |
|
|
19/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
02/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65733 |
|
|