Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 183 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17986 Week
» 71002 Month
» 190529 Year
» 3217382 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1676 |
m/e |
11/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5747 |
m/e |
01/1946 |
British Railways |
65747 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/04/1962 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
Information |
Shaped cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51E |
Stockton |
4w/e |
16/05/1959 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1922 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
08/1950 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1904 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1676 Built at Darlington Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5747 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65747 |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (51E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
16/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65747 |
|
|