Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1190 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18993 Week
» 72009 Month
» 191536 Year
» 3218389 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1146 |
m/e |
05/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5755 |
on |
24/02/1946 |
British Railways |
65755 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/06/1962 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Information |
Shaped cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1905 |
NPT |
|
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/06/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1920 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
10/1947 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1957 |
Darlington Works |
On the 10th July, D49/2 62727, B16/2 61435 and J26 65755 were noted repainted with the new emblem. There were no engines in the scrap yard waiting cutting up and all that could be seen were the wheels of A5 tank 69833. On Wednesday, 21st August, B1 61131 re-painted ex works was observed at Hett Mill working north on a goods about noon. In the afternoon, B1 61080 also repainted ex works was observed at Cowton working a south bound goods. On the same day, V1 67674, V2 60938 and O7 90469 were noted outside Darlington Works having been overhauled and repainted. In the sidings across Whessoe Road from the works, V2 60914, D49/1 62713, J77 68426 and D20 62387 were observed standing dead. In the scrap yard, T1 69916 was in course of being cut up, only the frames and wheels remaining. Diesel trains are working some services between Darlington and Richmond. With the commencement of the Winter timetable, further diesel trains are expected to be allocated to the Newcastle-Middlesbrough services. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1905 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1146 Built at Darlington Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1920 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
24/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5755 |
|
|
10/1947 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65755 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
04/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65755 |
|
|