Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1038 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18841 Week
» 71857 Month
» 191384 Year
» 3218237 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
412 |
m/e |
09/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5770 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65770 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J26 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 09/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 25/02/1959 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys |
Information |
Round cab spectacles by Grouping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1905 |
NPT |
|
Newport (Teeside) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/02/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1915 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
05/1920 |
Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
07/1922 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
12/1944 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
11/1947 |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
01/1954 |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1905 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 412 Built at Gateshead Works Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1920 |
Modification |
Diagram P2 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5770 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Modification |
Diagram 57 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65770 |
|
|
01/1954 |
Modification |
Diagram 57A boiler fitted |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
25/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65770 |
|
|