Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 121 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4081 Week
» 33667 Month
» 407680 Year
» 1629245 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 883 m/e 06/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5785 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 65785 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Tue 16/06/1959
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 53 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1906
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948
54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 20/10/1956
   Withdrawn on 16/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   on 16/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1948 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 883
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5785    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
09/1948 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65785    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
16/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65785    

prev prev