Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2594 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16000 Week
» 69016 Month
» 188543 Year
» 3215396 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1052 |
m/e |
10/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5793 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65793 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 16/04/1959 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SEL |
Selby |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 03/1952 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1906 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1052 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5793 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65793 |
|
|
03/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
16/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65793 |
|
|
05/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|