Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1626 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15032 Week
» 68048 Month
» 187575 Year
» 3214428 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1256 |
m/e |
11/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5796 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65796 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 15/05/1966 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
ALLOC |
52E |
Percy Main |
4w/e |
06/07/1963 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
27/03/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/05/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 10/1939 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 04/1958 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 02/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1906 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1256 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
10/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5796 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Percy Main (PMN) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65796 |
|
|
04/1958 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
02/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
15/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65796 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|