Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3118 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17161 Week
» 82115 Month
» 284779 Year
» 3311632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1004 |
m/e |
06/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5802 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65802 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
371a |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 07/08/1966 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
23/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
52E |
Percy Main |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
27/03/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/08/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 10/1944 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
by 04/1951 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
by 10/1957 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1004 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
10/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5802 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Percy Main (PMN) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65802 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
10/1957 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
07/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65802 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|