|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
05/11/1966 | Allocation of J27 class (North Blyth) | North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. | SLS/196701 |
13/08/1967 | Sunderland MPD | On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1007 Built at Darlington Works |
||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5804 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH) | ||
04/1948 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted | ||
04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65804 | ||
25/03/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
17/06/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65804 | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |