Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 286 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2851 Week
» 1589 Month
» 415910 Year
» 1637475 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1007 m/e 08/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5804 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 65804 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 08/1908
Withdrawal Sat 01/07/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967
Service Life 58 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1908
NBH Blyth (North) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 25/03/1967
52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967
   Withdrawn on 01/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52FS   8w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 52FN   4w/e 25/03/1967
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967
WDN   on 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1948 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803
18/01/1964 Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. SLS/196402
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (North Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1007
Built at Darlington Works
   
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5804    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (North) (NBH)    
04/1948 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65804    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65804    

prev prev