Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 86 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17889 Week
» 70905 Month
» 190432 Year
» 3217285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1008 |
m/e |
10/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5806 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65806 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
371a |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1908 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1959 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PMN |
Percy Main |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 03/1944 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1008 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
03/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5806 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65806 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (PMN) |
|
|
09/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65806 |
|
|
08/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|