Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 244 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2809 Week
» 1547 Month
» 415868 Year
» 1637433 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1017 m/e 05/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5812 on 27/01/1946
British Railways 65812 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L281
Works Number 18357
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 05/1908
Withdrawal Mon 05/06/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967
Service Life 59 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1908
PMN Percy Main on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52F Blyth (North) 4w/e 27/03/1965
   Withdrawn on 05/06/1967
52G Sunderland 4w/e 17/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 27/03/1965
WDN   on 05/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1949 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
11/1952 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
01/1959 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (South Blyth) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1017
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18357
   
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5812    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Percy Main (PMN)    
07/1949 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65812    
11/1952 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
01/1959 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
05/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65812    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev