Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4085 Week
» 33671 Month
» 407684 Year
» 1629249 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1027 m/e 05/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5817 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 65817 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell / V. Raven
Class J27
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L281
Works Number 18362
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 05/1908
Withdrawal Mon 01/05/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967
Service Life 59 yrs , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1908
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948
51L Thornaby w/e 29/02/1964
52E Percy Main w/e 17/10/1964
52G Sunderland 4w/e 27/03/1965
   Withdrawn on 01/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland on 13/04/1947
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   on 05/10/1964
REINS 52E Percy Main w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 27/03/1965
WDN   on 01/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1946 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted
09/1952 LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted
01/1960 LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/11/1966 Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1908 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1027
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18362
   
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5817    
07/1946 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65817    
09/1952 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted    
01/1960 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted    
29/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
17/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 65817    

prev prev