Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3756 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17162 Week
» 70178 Month
» 189705 Year
» 3216558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1028 |
m/e |
05/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5818 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65818 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell / V. Raven |
Class |
J27 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L281 |
Works Number |
18363 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1908 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 30/07/1962 |
Service Life |
54 yrs , 3 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
5w/e |
07/07/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 04/1948 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1908 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1028 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18363 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5818 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Haverton Hill (HAV) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65818 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65818 |
|
|
08/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|